Salceda v. Salazar et al

Petitioner: Leovardo Salceda
Respondent: John F Salazar and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2008cv01037
Filed: June 10, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Respondent's 56 Second Motion to Dismiss. The Petition is dismissed. Court denies a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/3/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
March 3, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and rejecting in part 48 Report and Recommendations. Denying Respondent's 28 Motion to Dismiss. If Respondent believes Petitioner should not be permitted to proceed w/ merits of his claims under the actual innocence ga teway, Respondent may file another motion to dismiss raising such argument w/in 45 days of the filing of this Order. If Respondent chooses not to file a second motion to dismiss, Respondent must file an Answer addressing merits of Petitioner's claims w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/3/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (jrl).
August 14, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Leovardo Salceda recommending that Court issue an Order approving and adopting this Report and Recommendation and directing that Judgment be entered granting the 28 MOTION to Dismiss the Petition w/ prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2009. Replies due by 9/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 8/13/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salceda v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leovardo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John F Salazar
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?