Dalton et al v. Lee Publications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Yvonne Dalton, Dian Garza, Arminda Guzman, Sharon Hughen, Etelvina Salgado, Hector Miguel Salgado and Refugio Sanchez
Defendant: Lee Publications, Inc. and DOES 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2008cv01072
Filed: June 17, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting 207 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; (2) Ordering Modifications to Proposed Class Notice; (3) Continuing Final Approval Hearing. Final Approval Hearing Continued to 2/20/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The preliminary approval hearing set for October 17, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/17/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
October 31, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 167 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. The Court VACATES the hearing scheduled for November 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/31/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
May 20, 2013 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 154 Defendant's Renewed Motion to Decertify the Class. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/20/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
March 22, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 53 Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment. There is a triable issue as to whether Plaintiff is an employee or independent contractor, and thus Defendant is not entitled to summary judgment on this ground. Partial summary judgment is granted as to Plaintiff's section 226, 203, 1174, and 450 claims. Partial summary judgment is also granted as to non-disputed issues regarding Plaintiff's meal and rest claims and to all 226, 226.3, 1174.5, and 1197.1 claims arising more than one year before the complaint was filed on April 18, 2008. Partial summary judgment is denied as to all other claims. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/22/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
July 27, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Deny Class Certification and granting 42 Motion to Certify Class. The Court appoints C. Keith Greer and Mary E. Kaye as class counsel. The parties shall work with Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes to give notice to class members under Rule 23(c)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/27/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
January 8, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Dismiss or Strike. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/7/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton et al v. Lee Publications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Dalton
Represented By: Curtis Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dian Garza
Represented By: Curtis Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arminda Guzman
Represented By: Curtis Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hughen
Represented By: Curtis Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etelvina Salgado
Represented By: Curtis Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Miguel Salgado
Represented By: Curtis Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Refugio Sanchez
Represented By: Curtis Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Publications, Inc.
Represented By: David D Kadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?