Wallace v. Small

Petitioner: Nathaniel Wallace
Respondent: Larry Small
Case Number: 3:2008cv01146
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation 78 ; the petition is denied with prejudice; Petitioner's request for counsel 77 is denied; the Court denies the Petitioner a certificate of appealability; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/15/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
December 1, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion to Transfer Petition for Habeas Corpus to the Central District of California: Respondent's motion is denied, but without prejudice should Respondent wish to file an amended motion to transfer in which it makes its position more clear. Respondent must do so within 14 calendar days of the date this Order is entered. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/30/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).
September 15, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Objections; and ORDER Adopting the 44 Report and Recommendation and Denying Without Prejudice the 29 Motion to Dismiss: Respondent is directed to promptly obtain the complete record so as to be able to file it without undue delay when required. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/14/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc)(jrl).
August 20, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 MOTION to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Larry Small. It is hereby ordered that the Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2009. The document should be captioned 'Objections to Report & Re commendation.' It is further ordered that any reply to the objections shall be filed and served no later than 10 days after being served with the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 8/20/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(leh)(kaj).
February 24, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot Petitioner's 17 Request for Ruling, 24 Motion to Enforce Direct Contempt, 26 Petition for Writ of Mandate and 28 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 2/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathaniel Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Small
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?