Hall v. National Union Fire INS Co of Pittsburg Pa et al

Plaintiff: Miles Hall
Defendant: National Union Fire INS Co of Pittsburg Pa, Associated Underwriters, United Truckers Association and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01195
Filed: July 3, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2010 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 164 Defendants' Motion to Take Additional Testimony or Order Trial; or Alternatively to Amend or Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/22/10. (lmt)
August 26, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting in part and denying in part 63 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) sua sponte granting partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff: Denies Defendants' motion for summary judgment of the causes of action f or declaratory relief and breach of contract; (2) grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment of the causes of action for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing and violation of California's Business and Professions Code § 17200; and (3) sua sponte grants summary judgment in favor of Plaintiff of the breach of contract cause of action. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/26/10. (lmt)
July 1, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 95 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Requesting Supplemental Briefing: The Court declares that Robert Hall is entitled to $1 million in coverage under his accidental occupation insurance policy at issue in th is case. In light of this declaratory judgment, the Court orders supplemental briefing on two issues: (1) whether genuine issues of fact remain for trial as to the second cause of action so as to defeat Defendants' 63 motion for summary judgme nt of this cause of action; and whether there is an adequate remedy at law. Each party shall file a supplemental brief addressing only these two issues by 7/19/10. Each party shall file a response in opposition by 7/26/10. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/1/10. (mkz)
December 8, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss the fourth and fifth causes of action of the First Amended Complaint without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file any amendment to the First Amended Complaint within 30 days of this Order being el ectronically docketed. The Court denies defendants' motion to dismiss the sixth cause of action of the First Amended Complaint. The Court further denies defendants' motion to strike. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/8/09. (pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. National Union Fire INS Co of Pittsburg Pa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Hall
Represented By: R Michael Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire INS Co of Pittsburg Pa
Represented By: Susan Jane Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Underwriters
Represented By: Susan Jane Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Truckers Association
Represented By: Susan Jane Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Represented By: Susan Jane Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?