Lyms, Inc. et al v. Millimaki et al

Plaintiff: Lyms, Inc., Wendy Youngren and Cathy Means
Defendant: Bruce Millimaki, Michael Eggert and Gary Berman
Case Number: 3:2008cv01210
Filed: July 7, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 280 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM DECISION. The Court concludes Defendants Millimaki and Berman are jointly and severally liable to Plaintiffs for the VCP-related damages, the amount which totals $68,418.70. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/2/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
March 19, 2013 277 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Decision Following Trial and Order For Entry of Judgment. The Court rules in favor of Plaintiffs. The Counter-complaint is dismissed with prejudice. In accordance with the Court's findings, Plaintiffs are directed to prepare a proposed judgment on or before April 2, 2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
May 9, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/27/2011 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 05/06/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
February 22, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 135 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on the Third Party Complaint for Indemnification. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Robert Lipsey on the Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
November 16, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 joint Motion to Continue hearing date to 1/4/2010 at 2:00 p.m. for motion to quash or modify subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/16/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
January 15, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 24 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/15/2009. Court orders counsel for the parties to contact Magistrate Judge Stormes' Chambers w/in 3 court days of the date of this Order to advise Judge Stormes of Court's ruling and initiate scheduling discussions. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyms, Inc. et al v. Millimaki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyms, Inc.
Represented By: Peta Lewis Hallisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Youngren
Represented By: Peta Lewis Hallisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Means
Represented By: Peta Lewis Hallisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Millimaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Eggert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?