Johnson v. Figueroa et al

Plaintiff: Charles Johnson
Defendant: A Figueroa, T Davis, Preciado, Orduna, D Bell, G Stritton, R Delgado, N Grannis and L Scribner
Case Number: 3:2008cv01242
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following in camera review of documents re 126 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 3/14/12. (lao)
October 31, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing Status Conference. The Court held a Status Conference on October 26, 2011. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/22/2011 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 10/31/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) Modified text on 11/1/2011 to reflect hearing held (lao).
August 23, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2011 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter. Counsel for Defendants shall make arrangements with the institution for Plaintiff to appear telephonically.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 8/23/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
January 25, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re 82 . Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is Granted with leave to amend as to Plaintiff 's conspiracy claim and Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claim. If Plaintiff chooses to amend, he shall file a Second Amended Complaint on or before February 28, 2011. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Com plaint is Granted without prejudice as to Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim against Defendant Figueroa is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 1/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
June 30, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Docs. 55 , 56 ) Motions to File First Amended Complaint, Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of First Amended Complaint, and Scheduling Case Management Conference. The Court schedules a Case Management Conference on August 11, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. in the chambers of the Honorable Louis S. Porter. Defendants' counsel shall appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 6/30/2010. (IFP package prepared) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cap) (jrl).
July 7, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court denies Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss, and strikes any monetary damages against Defendants in their official capacities. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 07/07/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Figueroa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Figueroa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Davis
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preciado
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orduna
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Bell
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Stritton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Delgado
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Grannis
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Scribner
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?