Medina v. County of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Medina
Defendant: County of San Diego, City of Encinitas, City of Solana Beach, Mark Ritchie, Karla Taft, Tim Fenton and Leo Nava
Case Number: 3:2008cv01252
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2017 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 175 Motion to Retax Costs. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/13/2017. (jjg)
September 25, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Jennifer Medina's 99 Motion to Compel Discovery of Country/Sheriff Department and California Highway Patrol Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 9/25/2014. (jah)
March 26, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 45 , 46 , 47 Motions to Dismiss. Based on the information stated herein, the Court Grants in Part and Denies in Part Defendants County of San Diego, Ritchie, and Taft's motion to dismiss, (Doc.[45 ]); Grants in Part and Denies in Part Defendant Nava's motion to dismiss, (Doc. 47 ); Denies Defendants Fenton's and Nava's requests for judicial notice (Doc.[47-3]); Grants Defendants State of California and Fenton's motion to dismiss, (Doc 46 ); and Denies Defendant Fenton's request for judicial notice (Doc. [46-2]). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 11, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing set for August 17, 2009. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/11/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Medina
Represented By: Anton C Gerschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Encinitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Solana Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Nava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?