Bartholomew v. Mendoza-Powers

Petitioner: Troy A Bartholomew
Respondent: Kathy Mendoza-Powers
Case Number: 3:2008cv01270
Filed: July 14, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 20 Report and Recommendations. Court adopts Magistrate Judge Stormes' well-reasoned Reprt and Recommendation in its entirety and denies the petition for writ of habeas corpus. Clerk of Court shall close the case. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/10/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
December 18, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT and RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge to Deny Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: No later than January 15, 2010 any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than January 29, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 12/18/09.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (av1).
June 2, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's 11 Report and Recommendations in its entirety and denies in part the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus w/ respect to Petitioner's equal protection claim. Respondent shall file response to the remaining claims by 6/20/2009. Petitioner shall file Traverse by 7/30/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/2/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
May 26, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Kathy Mendoza-Powers. Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's 11 Report and Recommendations in its entirety. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied in part, wit h respect to Petitioner's equal protection claim. Respondent Kathy Mendoza-Powers shall file a answer to the remaining claims in the petition by 6/29/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/26/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
March 13, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kathy Mendoza-Powers, 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Troy A Bartholomew. Recommending that Court issue an Order: 1.) approving and adopti ng this Report and Recommendation, and 2.) directing that Respondent's Motion to dismiss be granted in part in that the Equal Protection claim be dismissed and denied as to dismissal of the entire Petition. Objections to R&R due by 4/20/2009. Replies due by 5/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/13/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartholomew v. Mendoza-Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy A Bartholomew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathy Mendoza-Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?