Huck v. Pfizer Inc

Plaintiff: James R Huck
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01277
Filed: July 16, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED with respect to the intentional misrepresentation and concealment claims and DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/25/2011. (mtb)
August 26, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend; Denying Without Prejudice 42 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Extending Time for Defendant to File a Summary Judgment Motion: No later than September 3, 2010, Plaintif f shall file and serve the proposed amended complaint he filed as an exhibit in support of his motion. The time for Defendant to file and serve a summary judgment motion is EXTENDED until September 20, 2010. No later than October 4, 2010 Plaintiff shall file and serve his opposition, and no later than October 12, 2010, Defendant shall file and serve a reply. Upon filing of the foregoing, the motion will be deemed submitted. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/26/2010. (mjj)
August 11, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Joint Motion for Protective Order and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/10/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huck v. Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Huck
Represented By: Thomas F Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Aton Arbisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?