Buchanan v. Garza et al

Plaintiff: Whittier Buchanan
Defendant: E Garza, L. Fuga, Silvia H Garcia, E.A. Contreras, Baker, Limon, Saucedo, G Pederson, Verkoutern and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2008cv01290
Filed: July 17, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 173 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum without prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/19/2015. (rlu)
April 22, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 149 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's IFP Status Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Plaintiff has until August 1, 2014 to pay the initial civil filing fee in the amount of $350. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file a renewed Motion to Proceed IFP, along with a declaration. If Plaintiff chooses to file a renewed Motion, he must do so no later than sixty (60) days following entry of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee and is unsuccessful with a renewed Motion, the Court will dismiss this action in its entirety. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/22/2014. (rlu)
August 9, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 130 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/9/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
March 27, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 106 Partial Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/27/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
October 6, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER providing Notice to Pro Se prisoner of requirements for opposing Summary Judgment pursuant to Klingele/Rand and setting Brieifng Schedule. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ha s been calendared for hearing on Friday, December 9, 2011, in Courtroom 15. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion must be filed with the Court and served on all parties by Friday, November 25, 2011. All parties must file their Reply to the respective Oppositions, if any, by Friday, December 2, 2011. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/6/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
July 11, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 75 Motion for Joinder. If Plaintiff did not intend to invoke Rules 19 and 20 or use "join" in the manner the Court has explained, the Court is at a loss as to what Plaintiff is actually attempting to move the Court t o do. As a result, the Court cannot construe the motion as anything other than one under Rules 19 or 20. If Plaintiff intended to move the Court for something else, he may file another motion and explain precisely what he wants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/11/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
February 9, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel.Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/9/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
October 15, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) & 12(b)(6). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a final judgment, without prejudice, as to Defendants Sterling and Grannis pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 54(b). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/14/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
July 27, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' 46 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6). Final Judgment without prejudice is entered as to Defendants Verkouteren, Garcia, Pederson and Contreras pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/27/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan v. Garza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whittier Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Garza
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Fuga
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia H Garcia
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.A. Contreras
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limon
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saucedo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Pederson
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verkoutern
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?