Ruiz v. Clark

Petitioner: Roberto Carlos Ruiz
Respondent: Ken Clark
Case Number: 3:2008cv01376
Filed: October 5, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner's request for COA is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in this case, dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/16/2009. (Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
September 25, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and accordingly, Dismisses petition with prejudice. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(llb)
August 12, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Service filed by Ken Clark; This Court hereby recommends that Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Petition be granted; the Petition be dismissed with prejudice and that judgment be entered accordingly. Written Objections to R&R due by 9/2/2009; reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties within 10 days of being served with the objections.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 8/11/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ksr) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roberto Carlos Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Clark
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?