Lasalle Bank National Association v. Comair Rotron Inc et al

Plaintiff: LaSalle Bank National Association
Defendant: Comair Rotron Inc, Thermaflo Inc and Comair Parent Corp
Case Number: 3:2008cv01387
Filed: July 31, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2012 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Receiver's Twelfth Report re 161 Motion. It is hereby Ordered: The Receiver's proposal regarding further proceedings in the arbitration against Mr. Kuzmin is approved. The Receiver's proposals regarding tax penalties are a pproved. The Receivers's request to continue the receivership is approved. The Receiver shall file and serve his Thirteenth Report and Petition no later than June 29, 2012. Comments or objections shall be filed no later than July 9, 2012. The ma tter shall be calendared for Friday, July 20, 2012 at 1:30 p.m., but unless otherwise ordered, the issues will be addressed on the briefs and without oral argument. The Receiver shall notify interested parties of the Court's decision. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/16/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
May 31, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Receiver's Tenth Report re 147 . (Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.) It is here by Ordered: The receivership shall continue through the date upon which this Court makes a further O rder with respect to the Receiver's Eleventh Report and Petition for Instructions; and Pursuant to Civ. L. R. 66.1, the Receiver shall file and serve his Eleventh Report and Petition no later than September 30, 2011. Comments or objections shall be filed no later than October 7, 2011. The matter shall be calendared for Friday, October 14, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. The Receiver shall notify interested parties of the Courts decision. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
November 18, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Receiver's Sixth Report re 105 . The Receiver shall file and serve his Seventh Report and Petition no later than April 12, 2010. Comments or objections shall be filed no later than April 19, 2010. The matter shall be calendared for Friday, April 23, 2010 1:30 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/18/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasalle Bank National Association v. Comair Rotron Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaSalle Bank National Association
Represented By: Derrick M. Talerico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comair Rotron Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermaflo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comair Parent Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?