Kismet Acquisition, LLC v. Icenhower et al

Plaintiff: Kismet Acquisition, LLC
Defendant: Jerry L Icenhower, Donna L Icenhower, Craig Kelley, Martha Margarita Barba de la Torre and Alejandro Diaz-Barba
Trustee: Gerald H Davis
Case Number: 3:2008cv01446
Filed: August 8, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Bankruptcy Appeal (801) Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming Judgment of Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/20/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet) Modified on 5/21/2010 - certified copy sent to Bankruptcy Court (vet).
April 20, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Icenhower's Motion for Relief fromJudgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/20/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
August 18, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 31 Plaintiff-Appellee's Motion to Dismiss the Appeals of Defendants-Appellants and Request for Sanctions for Frivolous Appeals in its entirety. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/18/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet) (jrl).
September 3, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/3/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kismet Acquisition, LLC v. Icenhower et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kismet Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Ali M.M. Mojdehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L Icenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna L Icenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Kelley
Represented By: Ronald White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Margarita Barba de la Torre
Represented By: Geraldine Anthea Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Diaz-Barba
Represented By: Geraldine Anthea Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Gerald H Davis
Represented By: Gary B Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?