Bashkin v. San Diego County et al

Plaintiff: Paul Bashkin
Defendant: San Diego County, Howard Kluge, Bret Garrett and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01450
Filed: August 8, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2012 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 186 Motion to Retax Defendants' Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/5/12. (cge)
June 19, 2012 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 157 Ex Parte Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff is expected to be prepared to proceed pro se for the trial in the case, which is set to begin at 9:00 a.m. on July 9, 2012, in Courtroom 12. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/19/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (jcj).
March 8, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Plaintiff's Letter as a Motion to Amend the Pretrial Order and denying the 132 Motion. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/8/12.
April 19, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 92 MOTION for Order to Reopen Discovery filed by Paul Bashkin. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 04/19/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajf)
January 27, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' (Doc. 76 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The Motion to Dismiss is granted to the extent the First Amended Complaint restates a claim for unlawful detention. In all other respects, the Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/27/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
January 13, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Plaintiff's Ex Parte Statement Regarding Continuing Discovery Disputes (Re Docs. 80 , 82 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/13/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
October 12, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 15(a) and 16(b), the (Doc. 66 ) Motion for Leave to Amend is granted. No later than 14 days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff may file the proposed first amended complaint which is attached to the Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/12/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
August 13, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Docs. 56 , 57 ) Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/13/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
July 30, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for defendants to produce Internal Affairs Documents to Plaintiff; the Court finds IA # 2007016.1 (Bates stamp number 08cv1450 000001 000108) relating to the action from which the instant lawsuit arose to be relevant, not privileged, and orders the report and attached documents to be produced to Plaintiff. All personal identifying information other than names shall be redacted. Plaintiffs request for Defendants Kluges and Garretts personnel records and citizen complaints is denied as these documents are not relevant to any of Plaintiffs requests or any claims in the instant lawsuit. (Bates stamp 08cv1450 000109-000329); the Court will return the copies submitted for in camera review to Defendants for redaction of the documents that sh all be produced to the Plaintiff. Counsel for Defendants must produce the redacted documents to plaintiff no later than August 9, 2010; Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/30/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
May 20, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' 39 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is granted as to the following claims: Plaintiff's unlawful detention claim, and Plaintiff's second cause of action, "conspiracy to interfere with civil rights pursuant to 42 USC 1985." Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as to the following claims: Plaintiff's excessive force claim, and Plaintiff's unlawful search claim. No later than fourteen days from the date this Order is filed, the parties shall contact the chambers of the Magistrate Judge to schedule a case management conference regarding the status of discovery and to schedule a final pretrial conference date. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/20/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mkz) (jrl).
December 8, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendants' Motion To Terminate The Deposition Of Howard Kluge (Doc. 22 ), Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration Of Order Denying Ex Parte Application For An Order Extending Time To File A Motion To Amend His Complaint (Doc. 24 ), Defendant San Diego County's Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Respond To Interrogatories; Request For Attorney's Fees (Doc. 25 ), And Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant Howard Kluge To Produce Wri tten Responses And Organize Documents Without Objection Pursuant To Plaintiff's Request For Production Of Documents; Request For Sanctions (Doc. 29 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 12/8/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bashkin v. San Diego County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bashkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Kluge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?