Anzalone v. Hubbard et al

Petitioner: Scott Christopher Anzalone
Respondent: Suzan Hubbard and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2008cv01496
Filed: October 24, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation and denies a certificate of appealability(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
November 4, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/4/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
September 1, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 without prejudice Petitioner's Motion for the Appointment Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 9/1/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
May 14, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 22 Petitioner's Motion for expansion of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/14/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anzalone v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Christopher Anzalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Suzan Hubbard
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?