Pough v. Cate et al

Petitioner: Davy Kelvin Pough
Respondent: Matthew Cate, N Grannis, V M Almager, C Bradley and S J Ryan
Case Number: 3:2008cv01498
Filed: August 14, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the Report and Recommendation is adopted in its entirety and the court dismisses Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint without leave to amend and denies Defendants' Motion for a Strike Designation. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the file(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
May 26, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Third Motion to Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/26/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
March 19, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' Objections and adopts the R & R in its entirety. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/18/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
March 4, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/4/2010. The court adopts the R & R in its entirety and rejects Plaintiff's Objections. Further, the court grants Plaintiff 30 days leave to amend from the date of entry of this order to amend those claims dismissed without prejudice. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)(jrl).
January 6, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss should be granted in part and denied in part 27 . Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2010; Replies due by 2/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/6/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
May 4, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's second request for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/4/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
February 3, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion for appointment of counsel because it is not warranted by the interests of justice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/3/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pough v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Davy Kelvin Pough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N Grannis
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: V M Almager
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C Bradley
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S J Ryan
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?