North County Communications Corporation v. Verizon Select Services, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2008cv01518
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 100 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
August 10, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Strike Sections of Defendants' Second Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/9/2010. (knh)
February 9, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaim. Dismissal is denied as to Counts I, II, III, IV and VI; dismissal is granted as to Count V, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/8/2010. (knh)(mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North County Communications Corporation v. Verizon Select Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?