Hansen Beverage Company v. Vital Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hansen Beverage Company
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01545
Filed: August 21, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2011 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 156 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment. Court grants Dft's motion for partial summary judgment as to Hansen's claim based upon the Power Rush "No. 1 in L.A." advertisement. Court denies Dft's motion in all other respects. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/26/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
August 3, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Vital Pharmaceutical's 137 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Damages and Monetary Relief. Court declines to award Plaintiff monetary relief under either the Lanham Act or California Business and Professions Code 17200 and 17500. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/3/2010. (jah) Modified on 8/4/2010 - Changed restriction (jah). (Main Document 148 replaced on 8/4/2010) (jah). Modified on 8/4/2010 - NEF Regenerated (jah).
April 27, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Vital Pharmaceutical's 107 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative Partial Summary Judgment; denying Vital Pharmaceutical's 108 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Damages and Other Monetary R elief; denying Hansen's 109 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Court grants Dft's motion for partial summary judgment on the trade libel cause of action. Court denies Dft's motion for partial summary judgment on damages w/o prejudoce to it being refiled by 5/31/2010. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/27/2010. (jah)
October 1, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 10/1/2009. (jah) (jrl).
September 25, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. If parties wish to re-file a similar motion after Magistrate Judge Porter has ruled on the motion to amend the Living Essentials Scheduling Order, they are free to do so. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/25/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)(kaj).
September 17, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Any further requests that will affect dates on Judge Gonzalez's calendar shall be directed to Judge Gonzalez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 9/17/2009. (jah) (av1).
April 17, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Clerk shall docket Exhibit B to the Declaration of Edward J. McIntyre in support of Pla's Motion as Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/17/2009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen Beverage Company v. Vital Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hansen Beverage Company
Represented By: Edward J McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?