Hoot Winc, LLC v. RSM McGladrey Financial et al

Plaintiff: Hoot Winc, LLC
Defendant: RSM McGladrey Financial, Process Outsourcing, LLC and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01559
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2011 264 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING following Teleconference re: Joint Discovery Plan. The new discovery cut-off date is February 17, 2012. The new Pretrial Conference date before the Honorable Barry T. Moskowitz is May 15, 2012, at 3:30p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 9/12/11.(ecs)(jrd)
September 6, 2011 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 185 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.The motion is Granted as to Plaintiffs Fourth Cause of Action for negligent misrepresentation. The motion is Denied as to the remaining causes of action. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/6/11. (ecs)(jrd)
February 22, 2011 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 157 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as a Matter of Law Precluding Plaintiff from Seeking or Recovering Damages Allegedly Sustained by Non Prty Entities. Plaintiff has not specifically pled the agency theory in its Second Amended Complaint. However, even during trial, the Court may permit the amendment of pleadings to conform to the evidence. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(b). Therefore, the Court grants Plaintiff leave to file a Third Amended Complaint which pleads the agency theory of liability. The Third Amended Complaint must be filed within 20 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/22/2011. (jer)(jrd).
February 18, 2011 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Discovery Conference/In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 2/18/11.(jer)
September 29, 2010 183 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling Re: Designation of Hansen and Supplementation of Witnesses. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's seven witnesses. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to compel the production of CBIZ documents. The documents at issue shall be produced no later than October 15, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 9/29/2010.(jer)
August 19, 2010 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF 158 MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT L UNDER SEAL. Plaintiff's opinion that Exhibit L is "confidential" is not enough in and of itself to justify filing the exhibit under seal. If Plaintiff wants Exhibit L to be filed under seal, Plaintiff must file a supplemental brief explaining why the exhibit should be sealed. The supplemental briefmust be filed on or before September 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/18/2010.(jer)
July 12, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding the Parties' Respective Motions to Compel Further Answers to Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 7/12/10.(vet)
June 11, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Ruling Following In Camera Review Denying Application of Attorney-Client Privilege to January 8, 2007 Email. The Court hereby orders Defendant to produce the document identified in the May 17, 2010 privilege log to Plaintiff on or before June 25, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. on 6/11/10.(vet)
November 16, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Privilege Log and Application of Privileges. Defendants must receive documents 1, 5 and 14 through and including 16 pursuant to the protective order in place in the above-entitled matter on or before November 23, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/16/09. (vet) (jrl).
November 12, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant's 73 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/12/09. (vet) (jrl).
November 4, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Privilege Log and Application of Privileges. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/4/09. (vet) (jrl).
February 5, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Protective Order With Sharing Provision. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 2/5/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoot Winc, LLC v. RSM McGladrey Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoot Winc, LLC
Represented By: Michael John Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM McGladrey Financial
Represented By: M Cory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Process Outsourcing, LLC
Represented By: M Cory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Represented By: M Cory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?