Medical Sales & Consulting Group et al v. Plus Orthopedics USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Medical Sales & Consulting Group, Precision Medical, Inc., Precision Orthopedics Midwest, Inc., Orthocala, ORS, Inc., Martin Nichols, Chris Nichols, Emmett Bonamarte, Cindy Bonamarte, Kent Adams and Steven Tufts
Defendant: Plus Orthopedics USA, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01595
Filed: August 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 191 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The Clerk shall enter Judgment in favor of Defendants on Plaintiffs' claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, violation of the Wisconsin Sales Representative L aw, and violation of the Illinois Sales Representative Act. The Clerk shall enter Judgment in favor of Nichols on Nichols' claim for violation of the Colorado Wholesale Sales Representative Law for $34,664. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/25/2011.(knb)
May 19, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 115 Motion in Limine to Exclude Robert H. Walace's Testimony; Granting 116 Motion in Limine to Exclude the DPA; Denying 117 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence; Granting in Part and Denying in Pa rt 118 Motion in Limine to Exclude DPA and CIA; Denying 119 Motion in Limine Concerning Plaintiffs' Damages; Denying 120 Motion in Limine Concerning the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing; Granting 121 Motion in Limine right to sell Smith & Nephew Products; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 122 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Mark Distin. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/18/2011. (knh)
January 27, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 64 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/26/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
December 20, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2011 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/20/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
April 20, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The date and time of the Settlement Conference on May 7, 2010 at 9:00 AMis vacated and reset for June 30, 2010 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/20/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medical Sales & Consulting Group et al v. Plus Orthopedics USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Sales & Consulting Group
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Medical, Inc.
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Orthopedics Midwest, Inc.
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orthocala, ORS, Inc.
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Nichols
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Nichols
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Bonamarte
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Bonamarte
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Adams
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Tufts
Represented By: David J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plus Orthopedics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Noah A Katsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Noah A Katsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?