Rinaldi v. Poulos et al

Petitioner: Joseph Rinaldi
Respondent: M E Poulos and Edmond G. Brown, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01637
Filed: September 11, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding petitioners letter requesting copies of documents. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/18/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)(jrd)
October 18, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting (Doc. 29 ) Report and Recommendation; and (2) Denying Petition. The Court Adopts the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Louisa S. Porter. For the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, the Petition is Denied. For the same reasons, certificate of appealability is Denied. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/18/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
April 13, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 20 Without Prejudice Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 4/13/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (jrl).
April 3, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; and Denying 9 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss: In the absence of objections, the court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation. For the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, Respondents motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/3/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (jrl).
February 11, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION to Dismiss: Recommending that Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Writ of Habeas Corpus be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2009. Any reply to the objections shall be filed and served not later than ten days after being served with the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 2/11/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rinaldi v. Poulos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Rinaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M E Poulos
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmond G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?