Sheehan v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Marta E. Sheehan
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2008cv01658
Filed: September 10, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 44 Motion to Remand to State Court. Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' state law claims. This action is dismissed w/o prejudice to its being re-filed in state court. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/2/2010. (jah)(kaj).
September 2, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 29 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Clerk shall docket the Second Amended Complaint attached to Plaintiffs' motion. Hearing on Plaintiffs' motion scheduled for 9/14/2009 is vacated. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/2/2009. (jah) (jrl).
May 7, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Pla may amend her Complaint to include: 1.) I-Flow as a Dft, 2.) Mr. Sheehan as a Pla w/ respect to proposed loss of consortium claim against I-Flow only, and 3.) causes of action for strict liability, negligence, breach of implied warranty, and breach of express warranty against I-Flow only. Court denies Pla's motion to extent she seeks to add claim by Mr. Sheehan against USA. Amended Complaint shall be filed by 5/15/2009. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/7/2009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheehan v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta E. Sheehan
Represented By: Scott Spencer Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?