Bovarie v. Schwarzenegger, et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Bovarie and Wayne Wicken
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, Private Health Care Company, Matthew Cates, James E Tilton, Michael A Smelosky, V M Almager, G J Giurbino, N Barreras, L Calderon, D Khatri, Summer Aymar, Manaig, J Robinson, Candi Cook, Tetteh, Ko, Hodge, C Hammond, Navamani and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2008cv01661
Filed: September 10, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 123 , and overruling all of Bovarie's objections to the Report and Recommendation; granting defendants' 91 , 92 Motions for Summary Judgment; the Clerk is directed to close this case; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/6/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
February 25, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Ex Parte Request to Extend Discovery; Defense Counsel shall, no later than March 14, 2011, ensure that plaintiff has a copy of all of his mental health and medical files, including but not limited to GFR results; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
February 22, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Compel Production of Documents; defendants shall provide the discovery required by this Order no later than March 9, 2011; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/22/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj) (jcj).
November 2, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 72 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff, Issuing First Amended Scheduling Order, and Denying Plaintiff's 71 Motion to Ask the Court's Assistance to Conduct Depositions by Alternative Means; the Court also orders Defendants to respond to all of Plaintiff's outstanding discovery no later than December 3, 2010; the Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order shall be prepared, served and lodged with the Clerk of the Court on or before June 6, 2011; the final Pretrial Conference is reset on the calendar of Judge Burns for June 13, 2011 at 11:45am; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/2/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
July 27, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice appointment of investigator and expert witnesses 67 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/27/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
March 22, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in Part and Rejecting in Part 52 Report and Recommendation: Bovarie's claims against all of the Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed, with prejudice. Tetteh, Ko, Hodge, Cook, Hammond, Schwarzenegger, Cates, Tilt on, Smelosky, Almager, Giurbino and Robinson are dismissed from this case, with prejudice. Aymar's motion to dismiss is denied. Bovarie's claims for injunctive relief are dismissed. Bovarie's request for counsel is denied. Barreras, Calderon, Khatri, Manaig, Aymar and Navamani must answer Bovarie's remaining Eighth Amendment claim and pendant state law claims under California Government Code section 845.6 within 20 days of the date this Order is entered. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/18/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).
January 21, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 25 - 31 , 42 and 51 Motions to Dismiss: The Court recommends that defendants Aymar, Barreras, Khatri, Calderon, Manaig and Navamani's motions to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part and that the remai ning motions be granted in their entirety. No later than February 12, 2010 any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than February 22, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/21/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).
January 9, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice; Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendants Arnold Schwarzenegger, Matthew Cates, James E Tilton, Michael A Smelosky, V M Almager, G J Giurbino Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) & 1915A(b) and Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/9/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bovarie v. Schwarzenegger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Bovarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Wicken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Health Care Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cates
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Tilton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Smelosky
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V M Almager
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G J Giurbino
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Barreras
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Calderon
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Khatri
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Aymar
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manaig
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Robinson
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candi Cook
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetteh
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ko
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hodge
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Hammond
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navamani
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?