Technica LLC v. Carolina Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Technica LLC
Defendant: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company, Candelaria Corporation, Otay Group, Inc and Does 1 through 10
Cross Claimant: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company and Candelaria Corporation
Cross Defendant: Otay Group, Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv01673
Filed: September 12, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2012 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant's motion for reconsideration of the Court's March 13, 2012 order denying defendant leave to file third amended answer and counterclaim 157 . Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/14/12. (kaj)
April 12, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 153 Affidavit filed by Candelaria Corporation, Carolina Casualty Insurance Company, Otay Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/11/12. (cc: J. Crosby) (cge) Modified text to indicate document sent on 4/12/2012 (cge).
March 21, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying 85 Motion for Determination that there is No Reason for Delay in Entering Final Judgment on Complaint; and Denying 86 Motion to Amend And/Or For Relief From Judgment. Based on the foregoing stated herein, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's motion to amend or for relief from judgment is denied and their motion for determination for delay in entry of final judgment is denied. The Magistrate Judge is directed to set a case management conference in order to schedule all further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/21/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).
June 29, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 63 ) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Favor of Defendants on All Claims Presented in the Instant Complaint. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/28/2010. (cap)
August 10, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 defendants' application for leave to designate an additional expert. On August 7, 2009, the Court held a telephonic conference on Defendants' application for leave to designate an additional expert after the expiration of the deadline to identify experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/10/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technica LLC v. Carolina Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technica LLC
Represented By: James Scott Scheper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candelaria Corporation
Represented By: Robert J Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otay Group, Inc
Represented By: Michael Bryan Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Candelaria Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Otay Group, Inc
Represented By: Michael Bryan Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?