Kimpel v. California Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Jay G Kimpel
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, Robert Walker and P Jayasundara
Case Number: 3:2008cv01734
Filed: September 22, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 123 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot plaintiff's 119 Motion to Appoint Experts and to "Use all Medical and Mental Records in Trial". The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the Defendants and close the file. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/10/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
June 21, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 42 motion to dismiss plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, and denying plaintiff's motion for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint; because the Court finds amendment of Plaintiffs § 1983 claims would be futile at this time, leave to amend is denied; the Clerk of Court shall close the file. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/19/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
February 8, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Petitioner's Objections and Adopting Report and Recommendation: Kimpel's request for counsel is denied. The Court agrees with the Report and Recommendation to grant Defendants' motion to dismiss but allow Kimpel to am end his complaint. Kimpel must file his amended complaint within 28 calendar days of the date he receives this order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/4/10.(Amended 1983 form sent to Plaintiff, All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jcj).
August 25, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties on or before September 24, 2009. Any reply to the Objections shall be served and filed on or before October 5, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 8/25/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(pdc) (av1).
February 24, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendant California Department of Corrections and Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/20/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service, IFP Package sent).(pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimpel v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay G Kimpel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Walker
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Jayasundara
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?