Iglis et al v. D.R. Horton, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Frank Iglis and Teresa Inglis
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc., James Pritchett and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2008cv01825
Filed: October 7, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 joint Motion for dismissal with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/15/09. (tkl)(av1).
May 15, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 joint Motion to Continue expert discovery cut-off. The Mandatory Settlement Conference scheduled for June 8, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. remains unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/15/09. (tkl) (jrl).
April 2, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 dft's motion for general counsel to appear telephonically at the mandatory settlement conference set for April 13, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/2/09. (tkl) (jrl).
March 27, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 joint Motion to Continue ex pert dislosure deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/27/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 6, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 joint Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference to 4/13/2009 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/6/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
February 5, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 defendants' ex parte motion for Mr. Morice to appear telephonically at the mandatory settlement conference on Feruary 12, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/5/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iglis et al v. D.R. Horton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Iglis
Represented By: John Michael Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Inglis
Represented By: John Michael Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc.
Represented By: Evan B Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?