La Jolla Loans, Inc. v. Stanford et al

Plaintiff: La Jolla Loans, Inc.
Defendant: Daniel S Stanford and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01826
Filed: October 7, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Continue the Case Management Conference to January 5, 2010, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 11/6/09. (tkl) (jrl).
September 14, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall separately file the FAC within 10 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/14/09. (tkl) (jrl).
August 13, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 request for approval of substitition of attorney. Added attorney Robert Ross Massey for Daniel S Stanford. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/13/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (av1).
July 15, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on request for substitution of attorney 23 . The Court hereby orders that the request of defendant Daniel S. Stanford to substitute Daniel S. Stanford, pro se. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/14/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
March 17, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/17/09. The court conditionally grants the motion to set aside entry of default. Upon Defendant reimbursing Plaintiff for its litigation costs in the amount of $1,050, entry of default will be set aside. Payment must be received by Plaintiff within 10 days of the date of entry of this order. Finally, Plaintiff's motion for entry of default judgment is denied as moot.(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Jolla Loans, Inc. v. Stanford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Jolla Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Michael V Pundeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?