La Jolla Friends of The Seals et al v. National Oceanic and Atomspheric Administration National Marine Fisheries Service (NMFS) et al

Plaintiff: La Jolla Friends of The Seals and James H. N. Hudnall, Jr.
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atomspheric Administration National Marine Fisheries Service (NMFS), Carlos M. Gutierrez, James W. Balsiger, Rodney McInnis, James Lecky, City of San Diego and Does 1 to 100
Case Number: 3:2008cv01847
Filed: October 9, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 90 ) Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiffs La Jolla Friends of the Seals and James H. N. Hudnall, Jr. is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/26/2011. (mdc)
June 29, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The orders filed on 10/22/2008 and 12/18/2008 are vacated. All pending motions are denied as moot. This action is dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/29/2009. (mdc) (av1).
June 1, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant City of San Diego's motion to confirm the continuation of the Court's order prohibiting harassment or dispersal of the seal colony at the Children's Pool (Doc. 56 ) is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/1/2009. (mdc) (jrl).
April 28, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This Court concludes that there are no facts alleged in the Complaint which support judicial review of the second claim for relief under the Administrative Procedures Act. This Court has no jurisdiction to proceed against the Federal Defendant s. It is ordered that the motion to dismiss the Complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Federal Defendants (Doc. 12 ) is granted. Plaintiffs and Defendant City of San Diego are ordered to file briefs addressing the jurisdiction of this Court to proceed on the merits of the first claim for relief within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/28/2009. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Jolla Friends of The Seals et al v. National Oceanic and Atomspheric Administration National Marine Fisheries Service (NMFS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Jolla Friends of The Seals
Represented By: Bryan W Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. N. Hudnall, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan W Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atomspheric Administration National Marine Fisheries Service (NMFS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos M. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Balsiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?