Guardian Media Technologies, Ltd. v. Philips Electronic North America Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Guardian Media Technologies, Ltd.
Defendant: Philips Electronic North America Corporation, Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC and Toshiba America, INC
Case Number: 3:2008cv01859
Filed: October 10, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Joint Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Court approves the Final Judgment submitted by the parties. Clerk directed to file the Final Judgment in the case. Non-Guardian's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the '160 patent is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/24/2009. (jah) (Motion for Summary Judgment filed in cas no. 05cv1777)(av1).
August 31, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringment of U.S. Patent No. 4,930,158. Court grants summary judgment of non-infringement of the '158 patent because the accused players do not contain an "auxiliary device" and grants summary judgment of non-infringement of the '158 patent because the accused devices do not "compare a detected code to a set of codes". Court declines to reach the issue whether the accused devices "cause playing of the video program to be suspended". Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/31/2009. (jah) (jrl).
April 27, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/24/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
April 23, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking Paragraph 13 of Proposed Protective Order w/o Prejudice and Entering Protective Order as Amended. Granting Guardian Media Tech's 42 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Guardian's request to strike paragraph 13 of the propose d protective order is granted w/o prejudice to the Non-Guardian parties subsequent renewal of the challenge of the confidential classification of this material at some later date when an articulated need for the disclosure to in-house counsel can be demonstrated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/23/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardian Media Technologies, Ltd. v. Philips Electronic North America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardian Media Technologies, Ltd.
Represented By: Hugh Anthony McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronic North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?