Deployment Medicine Consultants, Inc. v. Pipes et al

Plaintiff: Deployment Medicine Consultants, Inc.
Defendant: Christopher F. Pipes, Anne Marie Conte and April Porter
Case Number: 3:2008cv01959
Filed: October 23, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/2/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(amh)
November 23, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 95 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
August 10, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 8/10/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deployment Medicine Consultants, Inc. v. Pipes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deployment Medicine Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Randall S Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher F. Pipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Marie Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?