Robbins v. City of San Diego Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Bruce D. Robbins
Defendant: City of San Diego Police Department, Randall T Henrizi, John J Alvarado and Jane Hodges
Case Number: 3:2008cv02003
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court hereby grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (kaj).
March 8, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment.The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (kaj).
February 1, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 joint application to modify scheduling order. Proposed final pretrial conference order by March 26, 2010. The final pretrial conference shall be held before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Miller on April 2, 2010, at 8:30 AM. The trial in this matter shall commence on May 3, 2010 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/1/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
January 19, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 ex parte Motion to continue motion for summary judgment hearing to February 19, 2010 at1:30 PM. Opposition by 2/5/2010; reply by 2/12/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
January 12, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 plaintiff's Motion for voluntary dismissal as to Officer Alvarado and Officer Diana Hodges. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/12/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. City of San Diego Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce D. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego Police Department
Represented By: Wendy Elaine Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall T Henrizi
Represented By: Wendy Elaine Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J Alvarado
Represented By: Wendy Elaine Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Hodges
Represented By: Wendy Elaine Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?