Wilson v. Sears, Roebuck and Co. et al

Plaintiff: Glen Wilson
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co. and Does 1 through 10, Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2008cv02061
Filed: November 7, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion In Limine to Bifurcate; denying 76 Motion In Limine to Bifurcate; and DENYING Plaintiffs request to Purse Claim for Failure to Engage in Interactive Process. The parties must prepare, serve, and lodge the Proposed PTC Order by April 2, 2011. The Final Pretrial Conference be held on April 9, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/3/2012. (mtb)
July 6, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting proposed pretrial order and continuing pretrial conference. Revised Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2011. The Final Pretrial Conference currently set for 7/11/2011 at 11:00 AM is continued to 8/15/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/6/2011.(mtb)
March 28, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying (Doc. 38 ) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or In the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment; and (2) Denying In Part and Granting In Part (Doc. 31 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/28/2011. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Sears, Roebuck and Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Wilson
Represented By: Robert A Waller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Represented By: Denise M Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?