Fractional Villas, Inc. v. Windsor Capital Mortgage Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Fractional Villas, Inc.
Defendant: Windsor Capital Mortgage Corp. and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2008cv02076
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion for extension of time for Defendant Linda Temko to respond to the First Amended Complaint by January 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/15/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
November 30, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Consent Order granting substitution of attorney 29 . Added attorney James Dennis Menke for Fractional Villas, Inc. Attorney Henry Harmeling, IV terminated. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
November 13, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on joint 28 Motion for dismissal with prejudice as to plaintiff's fourth and fifth causes of action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/13/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
August 6, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 joint Motion to file first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/6/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fractional Villas, Inc. v. Windsor Capital Mortgage Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fractional Villas, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Harmeling, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Capital Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?