Hirschfield et al v. San Diego Unified Port District et al

Plaintiff: Alan Hirschfield and Nicole Hirschfield
Defendant: San Diego Unified Port District, Clyde Williams and Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2008cv02103
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 83 Joint Motion to Dismiss Seventh Cause of Action Against Defendant San Diego Unified Port District. The Seventh Cause of Action in the First Amended Complaint shall be dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant San Diego Unified Port District. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/7/10. (vet)
June 28, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 92 Joint Motion to Dismiss Sixth Cause of Action Against Defendant San Diego Unified Port District. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/28/10. (vet)
June 24, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Pretrial Conference and Related Dates. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 12/8/2010. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/15/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/24/10.(vet)
June 11, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Re-Open the Deposition of Roger Clark [Doc. No. 79]. Roger Clark's deposition shall be completed before June 25, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/11/10. (vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirschfield et al v. San Diego Unified Port District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Hirschfield
Represented By: Eric R Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Hirschfield
Represented By: Eric R Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Unified Port District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?