Murray v. City of Carlsbad et al

Case Number: 3:2008cv02121
Filed: November 18, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Motions In Limine and Pre-Trial Schedule. The final pretrial conference shall take place on September 21, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. The proposed pretrial order shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/1/11. (jer) Modified on 4/1/2011 to note all non-registered users served via US Mail Service (jer).
November 22, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 85 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/22/2010. (jer)
July 19, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on False Arrest Claim. The Court grants summary judgment for Defendants Luc, Reno, and the City of Carlsbad on Plaintiff's false arrest claim. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/19/2010. (jer)
June 28, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 61 Motion to Join Additional Parties. Plaintiff shall file the Third Amended Complaint within 10 days of the entry of this order. Officer Luc may file a notice of joinder in the pending motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by the City of Carlsbad and Marc Reno. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/28/10. (vet) (jrl).
June 25, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Compel. Defendants shall produce Officer Luc's cell phone records for the period of August 17, 2008 at 10:00 p.m. to August 18, 2008 at 10 a.m. to Plaintiff's counsel on or before July 15, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/25/10. (vet)
January 11, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 28 Motion for Order to Determine the Sufficiency Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admission (Set One), or in the Alternative, an Order Compelling Further Responses and an Order Sanctioning Plainti ff for Failing to Respond; Granting In Part and Denying In Part 29 Motion for Protective Order and Request to File Second Amended Complaint; Granting In Part and Denying In Part 30 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/11/10. (vet) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. City of Carlsbad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?