Aviara Parkway Farms, Inc. v. Agropecuaria La Finca, S. P. R.de R. L. et al

Plaintiff: Aviara Parkway Farms, Inc. and Rancho Santa Fe Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Francisco Alberto Piccini Poloni, Oscar Humberto Pena Orozco, Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC., Richard Schumaker, Valley Fresh Produce, Inc., Juana Angela Poloni Trapletti, Mirtha Susan Gonzalez Federico, Jose Jesus Gonzalez Gonzalez, Adriana Libertad Aviles Ahumada, Jose Luis Perpuli Meza, Lourdes Angenlica Rodriguez Mayoral, Jose "PEPE" Geffroy, RS International Produce, Inc., Agropecuaria La Finca, S. P. R.de R. L., Salvador Pelayo Lopez, Salvador Pelayo Cardenas, Trinidad Cota Acosta, Jose Raul Aviles Geraldo, Salvador Pena Valles and DOES 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2008cv02301
Filed: December 11, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Joint Motion to Dismiss; Scheduling Order. Defendant Richard Schumaker is terminated in case. The court will hear Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against Defendants Agropecuaria La Finca, S.P.R. de R.L. and Jose Raul Aviles Geraldo on July 23, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for default judgment no later than June 18, 2010. Any oppositions to Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment shall be filed no later than July 9, 2010. Any replies shall be filed no later than July 16, 2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/2/10. (lao)
April 23, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 joint Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference Date to May 7, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/23/2010. (tkl)
January 29, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 joint Motion for Dismissal of Defendant VALLEY FRESH PRODUCE, INC. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/29/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
January 25, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing release of funds held pursuant to Temporary Restraining Order 67 the sum of $28,556.95. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/25/2010. (tkl)(jrl).
October 22, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 continuance of date for exchange of expert witness written reports and discovery and motion cutoff dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/22/09. (tkl) (jrl).
April 16, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Defendant Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC with prejudice 54 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/16/09. (tkl) (jrl).
March 3, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Defendant Valley Fresh Produce's request to be excused from the ENE. Counsel for VFP shall be available telephonically between 10:00 a.m. and 12:00 p.m., should the Court need to contact him during the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/3/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 2, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/2/09. This Preliminary Injunction shall remain in effect until further order of the court. Plaintiffs shall post a security deposit with this court in the amount of $50,000 before 5:00 p.m. on Februa ry 4, 2009. Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants with a copy of this order, and Plaintiffs' ex parte application and supporting papers, to the extent such service has not already been effected.This Preliminary Injunction shall be binding upon the parties to this action and all other persons or entities who receive actual notice of this order by personal service or other acceptable means of service.
January 23, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Defendant Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC. 1/30/2009.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/23/09. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviara Parkway Farms, Inc. v. Agropecuaria La Finca, S. P. R.de R. L. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Alberto Piccini Poloni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Humberto Pena Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC.
Represented By: Lawrence H Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Fresh Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juana Angela Poloni Trapletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirtha Susan Gonzalez Federico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Jesus Gonzalez Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Libertad Aviles Ahumada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Luis Perpuli Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes Angenlica Rodriguez Mayoral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose "PEPE" Geffroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS International Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agropecuaria La Finca, S. P. R.de R. L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Pelayo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Pelayo Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinidad Cota Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Raul Aviles Geraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Pena Valles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviara Parkway Farms, Inc.
Represented By: James A Testa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rancho Santa Fe Produce, Inc.
Represented By: James A Testa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?