Uhuru v. Marshall et al

Petitioner: Diallo E Uhuru
Respondent: John Marshall and Edmund G Brown, Jr
Case Number: 3:2008cv02424
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Respondent's 26 Motion for Reconsideration of 24 Order Granting Certificate of Appealability (Filed as Motion to Vacate Certificate of Appealability Due to Legal Error). Court limits its grant of a Certificate of Appe alability to the question of whether Petitioner is entitled to equitable tolling of the statute of limitations because of mental illness. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/20/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (jrl).
May 29, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Diallo E Uhuru. Court recommends that Respondent's 11 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be granted. Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2009. Replies due by 7/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 5/29/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
January 12, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Petitioner Diallo E Uhuru's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is denied. Case is dismissed w/o prejudice. To have the case reopened, Petitioner must by 3/10/2009, provide Court with: 1.) copy of this Order w/ $5.00 filing fee, or 2.) copy of this Order t/w adequate proof that Petitioner cannot pay the $5.00 filing fee. Blank Motion to Proced IFP t/w copy of this Order mailed to Petitioner. Case closed. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/12/2009.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uhuru v. Marshall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diallo E Uhuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Marshall
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?