Miller v. Catlett et al

Plaintiff: Curtis E Miller
Defendant: T Catlett and A Amat
Case Number: 3:2008cv02428
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling objections; ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and granting Defendants' 85 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 01/05/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
May 20, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/20/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
February 1, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting in part and rejecting in part 22 Report and Recommendation and (2) Granting in part and Denying in part 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court adopts the recommendation that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed for fa ilure to state a claim. Plaintiff's retaliation claim is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiff's state law claims are dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend. The Court rejects the Magistrate Judge' s recommendation to dismiss the Complaint for failure to exhaust. Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of exhaustion is denied, and their motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted. Plaintiff is hereby granted forty-five (45) da ys leave to file and serve upon Defendants a First Amended Complaint that addresses the pleading deficiencies associated with his retaliation claim. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/1/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
November 10, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting 12 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. The Court recommends that Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. (Objections to R&R due by 11/30/2009. Reply due by 12/14/2009.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 11/10/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Catlett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Catlett
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Amat
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?