Valentino v. United States Department Education et al

Plaintiff: Maria E. Valentino
Defendant: United States Department Education and Margaret Spelling
Case Number: 3:2009cv00006
Filed: January 2, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1346 Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/26/2010. (tkl)
September 16, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 motion to dismiss and granting leave to amend signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/16/09. The court determines that it presently lacks subject matter jurisdiction under the Little Tucker Act and HEA to entertain Plaintiff's claims. The court also grants Plaintiff l5 days leave to amend. (tkl) (av1).
June 11, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/11/09. The Court grants the joint motion 31 to continue date for filing of defendants responsive pleading by 7/15/09.(tkl) (jrl).
May 22, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 joint Motion to Continue date for filing of defendants' responsive pleading by 6/15/09. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/22/09. (tkl) (jrl).
April 14, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 joint Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Defendant NCO Financial Systems, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/14/09. (tkl) (jrl).
April 10, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 joint Motion to Continue Date for Filing of Federal Defendants' Responsive Pleading. Federal Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before May 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/10/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 26, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/26/09.It is ordered that the Parties' Joint Motion For An Enlargement Of Time In Which Defendant NCO May Plead In Response To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is granted 23 . Defendant NCO has to and including 4/15/09 in which to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (tkl) (jrl).
February 17, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/17/09. Court hereby grants the motion 19 and orders that the Federal Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before April 15, 2009. (tkl)
February 6, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/6/09. It is ordered that the Parties' Joint Motion For An Enlargement Of Time In Which Defendant NCO May Plead In Response To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is granted. Defendant NCO has to and including March 2, 2009 in which to an answer to otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentino v. United States Department Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria E. Valentino
Represented By: Andrea M Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department Education
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Spelling
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?