Watts v. Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Eva L. Watts
Defendant: Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, Countrywide Homeloans, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00043
Filed: January 12, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Saxons Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted. Accordingly, Plaintiffs claims for negligence and negligent infliction of emotional distress against Saxon are dismissed. The court instructs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Saxon.(tkl) (av1).
June 12, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted. All claims against Decision One are dismissed. Plaintiff's request for leave to file an amended complaint is denied. Judgment is entered in favor of Decision One. (tkl) (jrl).
June 11, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/11/09. The motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted 25 . All claims against Decision One are dismissed. Plaintiff's request for leave to file an amended complaint is denied 32 . The court instructs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Decision One. (tkl) (jrl).
March 9, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's fraud, RICO, cancellation, quiet title, and slander of title causes of action are dismissed as to Countrywide Homeloans and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Saxon Mortgage Servi ces without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiff's causes of action for TILA and RESPA are dismissed with prejudice as to Countrywide Homeloans, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Saxon Mortgage Services. Plaintiff' s causes of action for negligence and negligent infliction of emotional distress are dismissed without prejudice as to Countrywide and MERS only. Plaintiff shall file and serve an amended complaint within 20 days of the filing of this Order. Signed b y Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/9/09. (tkl) (jrl). Modified text on 4/8/2009 to reflect case dismissed as to Countrywide Homeloans and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. only - per chambers (lao). Modified to edit text on 4/17/2009 - per Chambers (tkl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva L. Watts
Represented By: David A St John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Homeloans
Represented By: Paula Lynn Zecchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Paula Lynn Zecchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?