Skinmedica, Inc. v. Histogen Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Skinmedica, Inc.
Defendant: Histogen Inc., Histogen Aesthetics LLC and Gail K. Naughton
Case Number: 3:2009cv00122
Filed: January 22, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 312 Opinion or Order of the Court Redacted ORDER: SkinMedica's 196 motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED. Histogen's 211 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. SkinMedica's 237 motion for final judgment is DENIED. Histogen's 287 motion for attorneys' fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/4/12.(lmt)
November 21, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 153 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement: the Court GRANTS Histogen's motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of both the '494 and the '746 patents. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/21/11. (lmt)
May 24, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Construing Disputed Claim Terms of United States Patent Nos. 6,372,494 and 7,118,746. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/24/11.(lmt)
November 23, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Defendants' 48 -3 Objections to Extrinsic Evidence Cited by Skinmedica in Support of its Opening Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/23/10.(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinmedica, Inc. v. Histogen Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skinmedica, Inc.
Represented By: Peter R Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Histogen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Histogen Aesthetics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail K. Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?