Tobin et al v. BC Bancorp et al

Plaintiff: Albert Tobin and Juliet Tobin
Defendant: BC Bancorp, Alliance Bancorp, Wells Fargo Bank, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ndex West, LLC., J & J Lending, Robert S. Garner, Loni Hall and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00256
Filed: February 11, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2010 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting in part and denying in part Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, (2) Granting in part and denying in part Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and (3) Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re 142 , 143 , 144 . Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/24/10. (lao)
July 23, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 139 Joint dispute statement regarding Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust' Company as Trustee for Alliance Bancorp Trust. Defendant IndyMac Federal Bank has been dismissed from the instant action and accordingly Plaintiffs' request for sanction or for an order to further compel a deposition against Defendant IndyMac is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/23/10. (lao)
March 12, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' Request for Second Deposition re 105 MOTION. To avoid any confusion on the matter, the Court orders Deutsche to provide a verified response that it is, in fact, holder of the note. This verified response must be prov ided on or before March 24, 2010. If Deutsche intends to claim that it is not in fact true holder of the note, Deutsche must notify the Court and Plaintiffs by March 17, 2010, and any limitations on Plaintiffs search will be reversed so that Plaintif fs may resume discovery calculated to reveal the true holder of their loan note. Defendants have until April 5, 2010 to provide supplemental responses, consistent with the orders of the Court as provided herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/12/10.(lao) (jrl).
February 1, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/1/10. (lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobin et al v. BC Bancorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Tobin
Represented By: Deborah L Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Tobin
Represented By: Deborah L Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BC Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ndex West, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loni Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?