Rideau v. Minnick et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Sylvester Rideau, Jr.
Defendant: L Minnick, S Babich, L Knapp, Kingsley, R Barnes, G J Janda, Larry Small, Tim Ochoa and S E Chapman
Case Number: 3:2009cv00296
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sua Sponte Dismissing Third Amended Complaint for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) & 1915A(b). Leave to amend is denied. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/28/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)
April 22, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 4/22/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
January 29, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case. The Clerk of Court to vacate the judgment entered on December 21, 2009 and DENY Motion for change of venue. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/28/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2010: # 1 Order) (tkl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2010: # 2 Order) (tkl). (jrl).
October 26, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sua Sponte Dismissing Second Amended Complaint for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) & 1915A(b). However, Plaintiff is further granted thirty (30) days leave from the date this Order is filed in which to file a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/26/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)(av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rideau v. Minnick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sylvester Rideau, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Minnick
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Babich
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Knapp
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsley
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Barnes
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G J Janda
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Small
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ochoa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S E Chapman
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?