MRC Golf, Inc. v. Hippo Golf Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: MRC Golf, Inc.
Defendant: Hippo Golf Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00327
Filed: February 19, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment. The order filed October 22, 2010 (Doc. 67 ) is amended. The clerk shall enter an amended judgment for Plaintiff MRC Golf, Inc. against Defendant Hippo Golf Company, Inc. as follows : Defendant Hippo Golf Company, Inc. and its officers, agents, employees, successors and assigns are enjoined and restrained from using in any manner the name or mark "Mitsubishi Rayon" either alone or in combination with any other words, w hich resemble said designation as is actually used by Plaintiff MRC Golf, Inc., in connection with the importation, distribution, advertising, promotion, offering for sale, and/or sale of any golf clubs or any other products; and Plaintiff MRC Golf, Inc. shall recover the sum of $1,321,535 against Defendant Hippo Golf Company, Inc. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/25/2010. (srm)
November 5, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Attorney Thomas L. Kautz; Callie A Bjurstrom and Peter K Hahn terminated. The Clerk of Court shall reflect on the docket that Law Offices of Gray Robinson P.A. and Luce, Forward, Hamilton & Scripps LLP are terminated as counsel for Defendant. Defense counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant by most expeditious means available and file a proof of service no later than November 9, 2009. No later than December 4, 2009 Defendant shall file a notice of appearance. Defendants answer may be stricken, default entered against it, and its counterclaims may be dismissed if it fails timely to comply with this order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/5/2009. (mjj) (jrl).
February 26, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure, and Other Relief; and Denying 5 Plaintiff's Motion to Retain Pleadings Seal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/26/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRC Golf, Inc. v. Hippo Golf Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRC Golf, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy R Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hippo Golf Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?