Parmer v. Alvarez et al

Plaintiff: David Earl Parmer
Defendant: Alvarez and Cuevas-Pedro
Case Number: 3:2009cv00412
Filed: February 26, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge re 33 , 35 . After a full review, the Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's recommendation in full and Grants Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/15/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
March 25, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/24/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
January 7, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(b) & 12(b)(6). It is Hereby Ordered that: (1) Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for failing to exhaust administrative remedies pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b) 18 is Denied; (2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for failing to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pur suant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6) 18 is Granted; and (3) Grants Plaintiff forty-five (45) days leave to file and serve upon Defendants a Second Amended Complaint which addresses each deficiency of pleading identified in this Order. Plaintiff's Am ended Complaint must be complete in itself without reference to his original Complaint. See S. D. CAL. CIVLR 15.1. Any Defendant not named and any claim not re-alleged in the Amended Complaint will be considered waived. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/7/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)(jrl).
December 1, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Transfer and (2) Providing Plaintiff Notice of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Wyatt v. Terhune and setting revised briefing schedule. The December 11, 2009 Motion hearing d ate is Vacated. (Opposition due by 12/24/2009. Reply due by 12/31/2009.) The Court will consider the matter fully briefed as submitted on the papers as of Thursday, January 8, 2010, and will thereafter issue a written Order ruling on Defendants' Motion without requiring any appearances or holding any oral argument. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/1/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parmer v. Alvarez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Earl Parmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvarez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuevas-Pedro
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?