Grooms et al v. Legge et al

Plaintiff: James Grooms, Brycemarie Phelan and Knukle, Inc.
Defendant: John Legge, Gwen Legge, Knukle, Inc., Artillery Distribution, Sean Myers, Devin Mercado and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00489
Filed: March 11, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Louisa S. Porter
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 60 Motion to Dismiss and 60 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying Defendants' 61 Motion to Dismiss and 61 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/8/2009. (jah)(jrl).
May 22, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in their entirety Defendants' 44 and 45 Motion to Dismiss, to Transfer for Improper Venue, or to Transfer for Convenience. Court finds Defendants have failed to make a strong showing of inconvenience to warrant upsetting Plaintiffs' choice of forum. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/22/2009. (jah) (jrl).
April 8, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Denying Plaintiffs' Motions for Contempt, Sanctions and Attys' Fees. Denying Defendants' Motions to Strike. Preliminary injunction is effective on the filin g of this Order. Plaintiffs' undertaking of $10,000, posted to secure the TRO, will be applied to this preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/8/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
April 1, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 30 Motion to Clarify the Extent of the TRO. Court finds that dfts have complied w/ the Order by closing the website. At this juncture, turing over control of the website would affect future purchase orders, which exc eeds the bounds of the quoted conditiional language. Court orders parties to hold status quo on the transfer of ownership of the website until 4/7/2009 hearing on plaintiffs' pending motions. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/1/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
March 30, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Discovery Conference. Discovery Conference was held on 3/27/2009. Court directs dft to file an ex parte application for clarification of Judge Gonzalez's Order on the transfer of the website. Court orders the parties to hold the status quo on the transfer of ownership pending clarification by Juidge Gonzalez. The matter of expedited discovery is now complete and the pretrial management is returned back to Magistrate Judge Porter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/30/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
March 17, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. The TRO is effective when Plaintiffs file an undertaking in the amount of $10,000. This Order and supporting papers must served upon Dfts by 3/18/2009. Plaintiffs' 4 Motion for Expedited Discovery is granted, the extent of which is to be determined by the Magistrate Judge. Dfts' Opposition to Plaintiffs' MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due by 3/27/2009. Plaintiffs' Replies due by 3/31/2009. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 01 before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/17/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grooms et al v. Legge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grooms
Represented By: Christopher A Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brycemarie Phelan
Represented By: Christopher A Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knukle, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Legge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Legge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knukle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artillery Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?