Dorsey v. U.S. EEOC et al

Plaintiff: Carey Dwayne Dorsey
Defendant: U.S. EEOC and The Surfer Restaurant and Hotel
Case Number: 3:2009cv00519
Filed: March 16, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/15/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
September 29, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/29/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
March 23, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and (2) Dismissing Action as to Defendant "The Surfer Restaurant and Hotel" [Doc. No. 1]. The U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon Defendant EEOC as directed by Plaintiff on the USM Form 285. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/22/2010. (IFP Package sent on 3/24/10)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. U.S. EEOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Dwayne Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. EEOC
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Surfer Restaurant and Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?