Easter v. CDC et al

Plaintiff: Charles Easter
Defendant: CDC, B Morris, Panchello and Perez
Case Number: 3:2009cv00555
Filed: March 18, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 84 ; Easter's objections to the Report and Recommendation are overruled; the objections of defendants Perez and Panichello are sustained, and the 52 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted as to claims against them; defendant Morris's objections are overruled and the motion is denied as to claims against him; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/7/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
March 9, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations, ORDER Granting in Part 15 Motion to Dismiss, ORDER Dismissing Claims: Plaintiff's claim for injunctive relief is moot because it is not available to him, and is therefore stricken. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/9/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) Modified to include text re stricken claim (pdc).
February 1, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 15 Motion to Dismiss: Recommending that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss should be granted in part and denied in part. Any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties on or before February 26, 2010. Any reply to the objections shall be served and filed on or before March 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/1/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easter v. CDC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDC
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Morris
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panchello
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?