Strong v. Walgreen Co. et al

Plaintiff: Matt Strong
Defendant: Walgreen Co. and Rudolph Bragg
Case Number: 3:2009cv00611
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Americans with Disabilities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 132 Motion for Attorney Fees, Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/17/2014. (srm)
October 10, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Review and Re-Tax Costs filed by Plaintiff Matt Strong (Doc. 139 ) is denied. The Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses, Expert Costs, and Sanctions Against Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Defendants (Doc. 132 ) will remain pending. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/10/2013. (mdc)
May 9, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Strike (Doc. 116 ) Plaintiff's post-trial submissions is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Strike (Doc. 108 ) certain evidence outside the scope of the final pretrial conference order is GRANTED. The following motions are denied as moot: Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Doc. 109 ), Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Legal Conclusions from Kim Blackseth's Testimony (Doc. 115 ) and Plai ntiff's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings (Doc. 114 ). The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff as to all claims. Any request for attorneys' fees shall be made by separate motion in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d)(2) within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/9/2013. (mdc)
November 8, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 66 ) Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Matt Strong is denied. The (Doc. 65 ) Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Walgreen Co. and Rudolf Bragg, Trustee of the Bragg Family Trust is granted in part and denie d in part. Plaintiff is Ordered to Show Cause why the Court should continue to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state claims by no later than twenty days from the date of this Order. Defendants may respond by no later than ten days from the date that Plaintiff's response to the order to show cause is filed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/8/2011. (mdc)
April 18, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 48 ) Motion to Amend the Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff has leave to file the proposed First Amended Complaint attached to the Motion to Amend as Exhibit A (Doc. 48 -1), except the nineteen barriers alle ged at page 4 line 25 through page six line 23 which were not alleged in the Complaint, no later than ten days from the date of this order. The Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff and Defendants refer to Plaintiff's prior Complaint. The Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants (Doc. 46 ) and the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff (Doc. 47 ) are denied as moot. Oral argument scheduled for 4/28/2011, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 is vacated. The parties may file any further motion by no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/18/2011. (mdc)
May 25, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This action is stayed pending the resolution of Chapman v. Pier 1 Imports. In light of the stay, all pending motions are denied without prejudice and all dates are vacated. The parties shall notify the Court within ten days of any decision in Chapman. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/25/2010. (mdc)
November 3, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 12 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/3/2009. (mdc)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Walgreen Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Strong
Represented By: Lynn Hubbard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?