Felton v. Marshall et al

Petitioner: Kelvin Felton
Respondent: John Marshall and Edmund G Brown, Jr
Case Number: 3:2009cv00732
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. The court grants a certificate of appealability with respect to the sufficiency of evidence claim (Ground One) and denies the motion with respect to the judicial bias and ineffective assistance of counsel claims (Grounds Two and Three). Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/25/2010. (Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
September 16, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and denies Petitioner's Objections. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/16/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
April 17, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Petitioner's request for Appointment of Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 4/17/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felton v. Marshall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kelvin Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Marshall
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?